+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Held in Senate Clerk's Office
- Regular Message Received From House
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Regular Message sent to the Senate
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
- Amend Adopted A3
- Amend Adopted A2
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Postponed To 05/21/2014
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Postponed To 05/20/2014
On July 26, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Fiscal Note Attached
On July 25, 2013 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On July 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
- Postponed To 07/25/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
On July 18, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary Subcommittee A, if favorable, Appropriations
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary Subcommittee B, if favorable, Appropriations
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (20)
+ − Votes (7)
May 21, 2014: A2 McNeill Perfecting Amendment Third Reading
- Yeas: 103
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
May 21, 2014: A3 Glazier Perfecting Amendment Third Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
May 21, 2014: A1 McNeill Third Reading
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
May 21, 2014: Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 39
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
July 26, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 37
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 20
July 26, 2013: M12 Suspend Rules
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 52
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 20
July 26, 2013: M4 Previous Question Second Reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 32
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 20
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor