+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On July 31, 2017 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2017-199
- Became Law W/o Signature
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2017
- Ratified
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S Amend SA2
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/28/2017
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amendment Withdrawn A1
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/27/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Amendment Offered 1
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/26/2017
- Reptd Fav
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 120
- 120-32.1
- 143
- 143-340
+ − Votes (4)
June 28, 2017: M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 2
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
June 27, 2017: Amendment 2
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
June 27, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
April 24, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2