+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 19, 2014 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Cal
On August 14, 2014 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 08/15/2014
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Failed A2
- Amend Tabled A1
- Placed on Today's Supplemental Calendar
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On August 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/08/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Education
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 115C -
+ − Votes (4)
August 14, 2014: Amendment 1 Motion 1 To Table
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 9
August 14, 2014: Amendment 2
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 25
- Absent: 9
August 14, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 9
May 8, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor