+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (79)
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Veto Overridden
On June 28, 2018 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2018-121
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
- Veto Overridden
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/28/2018
- Veto Received From House
On June 25, 2018 in the House:
- Vetoed 06/25/2018
- Received from the Governor
- Placed On Cal For 06/27/2018
On June 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Today's Calendar
On June 15, 2018 in the House:
- Ratified
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted
On June 15, 2018 in the House:
- Added to Calendar
On June 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conf Rept Re-submitted
- Conf Rept Withdrawn
On June 15, 2018 in the House:
- Conf Report #2 Adopted
- Conf Com Reported
- Conf Rpt Withdrawn
- Pres. To Gov. 6/15/2018
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/15/2018
- Conf Com Reported
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Reported
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Conferees Changed
On June 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/07/2018
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Select Committee on Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On October 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On October 5, 2017 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A9
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Failed A11
- Amendment Withdrawn A10
- Ordered Engrossed
- Amend Failed A8
- Amend Adopted A7
- Amend Failed A6
- Amendment Withdrawn A5
- Amend Adopted A4
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Adopted A1
- Amend Failed A3
On October 4, 2017 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 10/05/2017
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 3
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On August 30, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On House Select Committee on Judicial Redistricting
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 06/28/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Re-ref Com On Elections and Ethics Law
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/27/2017
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary I
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (18)
+ − Statutes Amended (16)
+ − Votes (14)
June 28, 2018: Motion 11 Veto Override
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 4
June 27, 2018: Veto Override
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 45
- Present/NV: 1
June 15, 2018: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 37
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 18
June 15, 2018: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 15
October 5, 2017: A4 Floyd Second Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 7
October 5, 2017: A6 Graham, C. Second Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 66
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 7
October 5, 2017: A7 Pierce Second Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 7
October 5, 2017: A3 Fisher Second Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 65
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 7
October 5, 2017: A8 Morey Second Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 66
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 6
October 5, 2017: A9 Pierce Second Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 6
October 5, 2017: A11 Richardson, W. Second Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 62
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 6
October 5, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 43
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 6
October 5, 2017: A1 Reives Second Reading
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 8
October 5, 2017: A2 Willingham Second Reading
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 8