+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/07/2013
- Withdrawn From Cal
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/06/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2013: A1 Schaffer Second Reading
- Yeas: 118
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
May 7, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 40
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (57)
Type:
Primary Sponsor