+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On June 22, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/22/2015
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Finance
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (26)
- 8
- 90
- 8-53.14
- 90-270.4
- 90-726.1
- 90-726.10
- 90-726.11
- 90-726.12
- 90-726.13
- 90-726.14
- 90-726.15
- 90-726.16
- 90-726.17
- 90-726.18
- 90-726.2
- 90-726.3
- 90-726.5
- 90-726.7
- 90-726.8
- 90-726.9
- 90726.2A
- 90726.6
- 90-726.4
- 90-726.6
- 90726.15
- 90726.5
+ − Vote
June 22, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 110
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor