+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On October 22, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 10/22/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-284
On September 22, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 9/22/2015
On September 21, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On September 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On September 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Health
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 90
- 90-113.22
+ − Votes (2)
September 17, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
April 27, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor