+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2015-24
- Signed by Gov. 5/21/2015
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 5/14/2015
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reptd Fav
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On State and Local Government
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/10/2015
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Local Government
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 12, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
March 10, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Absent: 3