+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Failed A1
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 04/26/2017
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/25/2017
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary III
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
+ − Votes (2)
April 26, 2017: A1 McNeill Second Reading
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 87
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
April 26, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 28
- Absent: 2