+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 5/14/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-19
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 5/8/2015
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Commerce
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Regulatory Reform
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 150B-19
- 150B
+ − Votes (3)
May 6, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 2
April 28, 2015: A1 Arp Second Reading
- Yeas: 118
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
April 28, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 119
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor