+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/26/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 14
- 14-415.1
- 14-54
+ − Votes (2)
April 26, 2017: A1 Brawley Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Present/NV: 3
April 26, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2