+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2015-42
- Ratified
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/31/2015
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Appropriations
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 31, 2015: A1 Bishop Second Reading
- Yeas: 118
- Absent: 2
March 31, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 118
- Absent: 2