+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On July 1, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 7/1/2020
- Ch. SL 2020-62
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 6/25/2020
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S Amend SA1
- Added to Calendar
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 06/25/2020
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 05/07/2019
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 24, 2020: M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1
- Yeas: 115
- Absent: 5
June 24, 2020: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3