+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/11/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-74
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/3/2015
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/01/2015
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Placed On Cal For 05/26/2015
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary III
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Judiciary III
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 14
- 14-34.6
+ − Votes (3)
June 1, 2015: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 109
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 8
May 26, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
April 29, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor