+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 25, 2018 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2018-86
- Signed by Gov. 6/25/2018
On June 15, 2018 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/15/2018
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S Com Sub
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/13/2018
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary IV
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 50
- 50-19.1
- 7B
- 7B-901
+ − Votes (3)
June 13, 2018: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 105
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 6
June 12, 2018: Second Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 6
April 19, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor