+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On September 20, 2021 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2021-159
- Signed by Gov. 9/20/2021
On September 10, 2021 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 9/10/2021
On September 9, 2021 in the House:
- Ratified
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On September 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On August 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Commerce and Insurance
On August 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 05/11/2021
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Banking, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
September 8, 2021: Second Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 8
May 11, 2021: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4