+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 20, 2021 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On June 22, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor