+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (40)
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/30/2016
- Ch. SL 2016-73
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2016
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 27, 2016 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/28/2016
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 24, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed
On June 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
On August 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On July 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 08/05/2015
On July 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 07/29/2015
On July 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/29/2015
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 15A
- 15A-1465
- 15A-1466
- 15A-1467
- 15A-1468
- 15A-1471
- 15A-1475
- 15A-1460
- 15A-1469
+ − Votes (4)
June 28, 2016: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 116
- Absent: 4
June 24, 2016: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 10
June 24, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 10
April 30, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 110
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor