+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
- Withdrawn From Com
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/28/2015
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Appropriations
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 15A
- 148
- 148-82
+ − Vote
April 28, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 118
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor