+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/30/2016
- Ch. SL 2016-50
On June 24, 2016 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/24/2016
On June 23, 2016 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 22, 2016 in the House:
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 21, 2016 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/22/2016
On June 20, 2016 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Health Care
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/22/2015
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Insurance
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 58
- 58-50-30
- 58-50-30.
- 122C-24.1
- 131D-34
- 122C
- 131D
+ − Votes (3)
June 22, 2016: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 110
- Absent: 10
June 15, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
April 22, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2