+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Without Prejudice
- Ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Insurance, if favorable, Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Serial Referral To Insurance Stricken
- Serial Referral To Commerce and Job Development Stricken
- Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Serial Referral To Appropriations Added
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 97
- 97-53
- 97-53.1
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor