+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/26/2019
- Ch. SL 2019-55
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/21/2019
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred In S Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/19/2019
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 06/13/2019
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/25/2019
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Education - Universities, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
June 19, 2019: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 114
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
June 13, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor