+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Ways & Means
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/29/2015
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Serial Referral To Appropriations Stricken
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Appropriations
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 115C-296
- 115C-472.16
- 116
- 116-209.60
- 116-209.61
- 116-209.62
- 116-209.63
+ − Vote
April 29, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 120
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor