+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Postponed To 04/29/2015
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/27/2015
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Education - K-12
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 115C
+ − Votes (2)
April 29, 2015: M4 Previous Question Second Reading
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 33
- Present/NV: 4
April 29, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor