+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Transportation
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/22/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Vote
April 22, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor