+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 26, 2018 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2018-102
- Became Law W/o Signature
On June 15, 2018 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/15/2018
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S Com Sub
- Added to Calendar
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Select Committee on Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Failed A1
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Elections and Ethics Law
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 163
- 163-12
- 163A
- 163A-720
+ − Votes (5)
June 13, 2018: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 39
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 7
June 12, 2018: Second Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 6
April 26, 2017: A1 Floyd Second Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 66
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
April 26, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 44
- Absent: 2
April 26, 2017: Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 41
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor