+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 5/21/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-32
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 5/20/2015
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Postponed To 04/28/2015
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 04/23/2015
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary III
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 90
- 90-95
+ − Votes (3)
May 18, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 4
April 28, 2015: A1 Horn Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
April 28, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor