+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 7/3/2013
- Ch. SL 2013-243
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2013
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/24/2013
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Rec From Senate
- Rec To Concur S Com Sub
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 05/09/2013
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned To Judiciary Subcommittee A
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Finance
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 20
- 20-141.5
- 20-28.2
- 20-28.3
- 20-28.4
- 20-28.8
- 20-54.1
+ − Votes (3)
June 24, 2013: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 107
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 10
June 18, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 50
May 9, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor