+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Cal
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/27/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary III
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary III
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 20
- 20-166.1
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor