+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 22, 2018 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2018-30
- Signed by Gov. 6/22/2018
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2018
- Ratified
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S Com Sub
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/14/2018
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Special Message Received From House
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement
- Withdrawn From Com
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Appropriations
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 142
- 143C
- 142-15.4
- 142-96
- 143C-4-2
- 143C-4-8
- 143C-4-9
+ − Votes (3)
June 14, 2018: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 102
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 15
June 13, 2018: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
June 29, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 8