+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/06/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/02/2017
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 20
- 75A
- 20-141.4
- 75A-10.3
+ − Vote
March 6, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 32
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3