+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2017-17
- Signed by Gov. 5/23/2017
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 5/17/2017
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Ratified
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Added to Calendar
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
- Reptd Fav
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Appropriations
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- No affected General Statutes
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
April 27, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3