+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed On Cal For 05/14/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 153A-348.1 -
- 160A-394 -
- 47I-1 -
+ − Vote
May 14, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor