+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/20/2017
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Health
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
April 20, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5