+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Serial Referral To Appropriations Added
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Serial Referral To Appropriations Stricken
- Serial Referral To Finance Added
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary II, if favorable, Appropriations
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (38)
- 14 -
- 15A -
- 20 -
- 64 -
- 153A -
- 160A -
- 14-100.1 -
- 153A-145.5 -
- 15A-533 -
- 15A-534.7 -
- 160A-499.4 -
- 20-30 -
- 20-37.8 -
- 64-6 -
- 64-7 -
- 64-8 -
- 64-9 -
- 105-113.82 -
- 105-164.44F -
- 105-164.44I -
- 105-164.44L -
- 105-187.19 -
- 136-41.1 -
- 143B-919 -
- 64-33.1 -
- 64-49 -
- 64-50 -
- 64-51 -
- 64-52 -
- 64-53 -
- 64-54 -
- 64-55 -
- 64-56 -
- 64-57 -
- 64-58 -
- 64-59 -
- 160 -
- 105 -
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor