+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (37)
On July 3, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-242
- Signed by Gov. 7/3/2013
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/25/2013
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/20/2013
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Rec From Senate
- Rec To Concur S Com Sub
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/17/2013
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/13/2013
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Adopted A3
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Amend Failed A1
- Amendment Withdrawn A2
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 05/13/2013
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/08/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Agriculture
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 143 -
- 143-135.37 -
+ − Votes (7)
June 20, 2013: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 105
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 13
June 17, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
June 17, 2013: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 46
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
May 13, 2013: A3 Presnell Third Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 4
May 13, 2013: Third Reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 43
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4
May 8, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 34
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
May 8, 2013: A1 Samuelson Second Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 58
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor