+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 3, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-241
- Signed by Gov. 7/3/2013
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/25/2013
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/20/2013
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Rec To Concur S Com Sub
- Rec From Senate
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 06/17/2013
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Transportation
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Transportation
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (3)
June 20, 2013: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 104
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 13
June 17, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
May 13, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor