+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On August 1, 2014 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2014-94
- Signed by Gov. 8/1/2014
On July 28, 2014 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/28/2014
On July 25, 2014 in the House:
- Ratified
On July 24, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On July 23, 2014 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 07/24/2014
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On July 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On July 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On July 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/13/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Government
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 130A -
- 131D -
- 153A -
- 160A -
- 130A-250 -
- 131D-2.1 -
- 153A-341.3 -
- 160A-383.5 -
- 160A-442 -
+ − Votes (3)
July 24, 2014: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 108
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 9
July 23, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
May 13, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor