+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Added to Calendar
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (15)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor