+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
March 10, 2021: Second Reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 51
- Absent: 2