+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Adopted A3
- Failed 2nd Reading
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Placed On Cal For 06/26/2017
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 05/24/2017
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/23/2017
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Serial Referral To Commerce and Job Development Stricken
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Commerce and Job Development
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
+ − Votes (4)
June 26, 2017: A1 McGrady Second Reading
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 6
June 26, 2017: A2 Dollar Second Reading
- Yeas: 106
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 6
June 26, 2017: A3 Stevens Second Reading
- Yeas: 109
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 6
June 26, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 60
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor