+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 22, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/22/2018
- Ch. SL 2018-26
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Concurred In S Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2018
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/14/2018
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary IV
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (3)
June 14, 2018: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 103
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 15
June 13, 2018: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
April 19, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor