+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Amend Failed A1
- Amend Failed A2
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 02/23/2017
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 02/22/2017
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Education - K-12
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (4)
February 23, 2017: A1 Graham, C. Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 65
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 8
February 23, 2017: A2 Insko Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 68
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 8
February 23, 2017: Third Reading
- Yeas: 106
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 8
February 22, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor