+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/27/2015
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 1A
- 1A-1
+ − Vote
April 27, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Absent: 3