+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2015-49
- Signed by Gov. 6/3/2015
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 5/27/2015
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 05/20/2015
- Withdrawn From Cal
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (5)
May 21, 2015: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 110
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 2
May 21, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
May 20, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
April 16, 2015: A1 Whitmire Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
April 16, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor