+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/25/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Wildlife Resources
- Withdrawn From Com
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 145
- 145-49
+ − Vote
April 25, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1