+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2016-74
- Signed by Gov. 6/30/2016
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2016
- Ratified
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On June 27, 2016 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/28/2016
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Transportation
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Commerce and Job Development
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (3)
June 28, 2016: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 116
- Absent: 4
June 27, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 1
April 22, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Absent: 5