+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-208
- Signed by Gov. 6/26/2013
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/18/2013
- Ratified
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/17/2013
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Rec To Concur S Com Sub
- Rec From Senate
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Placed On Cal For 06/11/2013
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/18/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Education
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 115C -
- 115C-174.11 -
- 115C-174.22 -
+ − Votes (5)
June 17, 2013: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 112
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7
June 11, 2013: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
June 11, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
April 18, 2013: A1 Whitmire Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
April 18, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor