+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/20/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary IV
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 1
- 1-17
- 1-52
- 1-56
+ − Vote
April 20, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor