+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 12, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 7/12/2017
- Ch. SL 2017-110
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Concurred In S Amend SA1
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub and S Amend
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/29/2017
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary III
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Votes (5)
June 29, 2017: M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 7
June 29, 2017: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 112
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7
June 28, 2017: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 45
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
June 28, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
April 11, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Absent: 7